Trustees CHRIST'S COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE FIRST FOUNDED BY KING HENRY VI OF ENGLAND AND AFTER HIS DEATH
Charity number: 1137540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Simon McDonald of Salford GCMG KCVO | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Caroline Vout | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nick Gay | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Farbod Akhlaghi-Ghaffarokh | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Francis Patrick Kelly FRS | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Mary Franklin-Brown | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harriet Lyon | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Read | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Parsons | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Peter Monie | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emily Jane Tomlinson | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Michael Mortier | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Philip Housden | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.