ST GEORGE'S DAY CENTRE (BOLTON) LTD

Charity number: 1124588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time Download