SOFRONIE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1118621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.12m £2.23m £2.20m £2.21m £2.12m
Total expenditure £922.90k £880.77k £5.93m £2.87m £2.44m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.12m £2.23m £2.20m £2.20m £2.12m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £34 £667 £869 £141
Income - Other £126 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £922.90k £880.77k £5.93m £2.87m £2.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £10.40k £12.25k £13.47k £10.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £788.42k £671.40k £5.72m £2.63m £2.23m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0