THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN'S ARMITAGE

Charity number: 1119007
Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 10 days
Accounts and TAR 14 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 10 days
Annual return 14 November 2019 10 October 2020 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 14 November 2018 17 January 2020 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 14 November 2017 10 October 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 14 November 2016 24 October 2017 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 November 2016 Not Required