THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN'S ARMITAGE

Charity number: 1119007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 14/11/2016 14/11/2017 14/11/2018 14/11/2019 14/11/2020
Total gross income £683 £603 £1.16k £792 £1.10k
Total expenditure £858 £888 £276 £252 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A