Governing document Hornsey Girls Home School Association
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 NOV 2006 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED ON 27 FEB 2017 as amended on 18 Apr 2023 as amended on 30 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF HORNSEY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE SCHOOL. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
HARINGEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.