BARWAQA RELIEF ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1121274
Charity reporting is up to date (118 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £67.36k £52.04k £45.94k £49.19k £62.42k
Total expenditure £67.16k £51.77k £45.93k £47.34k £47.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.21k £41.75k N/A N/A N/A