Financial history ST ELMO MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1119986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £63.13k £495 £516 £137 £5.63k
Total expenditure £27.50k £9.72k £17.35k £12.55k £14.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A