ACE YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 1120282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £46.60k £27.18k £43.52k £41.22k £66.39k
Total expenditure £25.64k £26.66k £35.43k £51.66k £53.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.04k £0 N/A N/A £25.66k