ACE YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 1120282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Robert Woore Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Helen Wainwright Trustee 13 June 2018 None on record
Rev PHILIP MICHELL Trustee 12 November 2013 None on record
Jane Denise Stoney Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Louise Doble Chair 19 November 2009 None on record