Financial history ADRIANS CHARITY

Charity number: 1120412
Charity reporting is overdue by 503 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £17.48k £15.78k £23.53k £19.60k £2.89k
Total expenditure £24.61k £42.36k £17.76k £26.00k £624.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A