Financial history WHEATHAMPSTEAD PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1118728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £105.93k £123.49k £104.74k £99.94k £100.12k
Total expenditure £107.18k £115.77k £101.62k £93.97k £107.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A