Accounts and annual returns The VOCES8 Foundation

Charity number: 1126785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 09 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 July 2020 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 July 2020 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 17 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window