VOCES CANTABILES MUSIC LIMITED

Charity number: 1126785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROY BLACKWELL Chair 03 May 2012 None on record
Lord Lisvane KCB DL Trustee 30 March 2017 None on record
PETER DART MA Trustee 22 May 2014
ROYAL CHORAL SOCIETY LIMITED Received: On time
THE ORCHID CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
ICOULD LIMITED Overdue by 233 days
DUNCAN YORK ANDREW SOUSTER Trustee 24 November 2013 None on record
Eleanor Mary Wardle Trustee 22 November 2014 None on record
SARAH HOLFORD Trustee 01 September 2014
SWAP'RA (SUPPORTING WOMEN AND PARENTS IN OPERA) Received: On time
SALLY ELIZABETH CANTELLO Trustee 30 March 2017 None on record
Rev JOHN BARTLETT SMITH Trustee None on record
William J Conner Trustee 11 January 2018
PUSHKIN HOUSE TRUST Received: On time