WHITEHAVEN HARBOUR YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1120763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time Download