ALEXANDER USHER LIMITED

Charity number: 1118812
Charity reporting is overdue by 233 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 April 2020 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 April 2020 83 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 November 2018 289 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 November 2018 289 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 November 2018 654 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 16 November 2018 654 days late Download