ALEXANDER USHER LIMITED

Charity number: 1118812
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £262.50k £315.65k £88.00k £313.00k £201.00k
Total expenditure £290.93k £305.83k £146.65k £309.38k £265.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A