BROWNEDGE RC PRIMARY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1119784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 March 2021 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 March 2021 268 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 18 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required