JUST FOR KIDS LAW LIMITED

Charity number: 1121638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 29 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 27 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 27 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 24 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 24 March 2017 On time Download