JUST FOR KIDS LAW LIMITED

Charity number: 1121638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £789.53k £1.29m £1.50m £1.90m £2.17m
Total expenditure £908.96k £1.16m £1.50m £1.72m £1.76m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £151.29k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £747.14k £237.53k £325.27k £616.38k £919.55k
Income - Other trading activities £7.83k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £32.83k £1.01m £1.12m £1.21m £1.21m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.74k £1.20k £733 £1.05k £1.55k
Income - Other £0 £36.63k £51.44k £64.15k £42.54k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £908.96k £1.15m £1.46m £1.69m £1.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £17.25k £38.33k £30.69k £54.23k
Expenditure - Governance £6.05k £12.53k £13.74k £13.29k £10.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0