The Abraham Initiatives

Charity number: 1119571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Basha'er Fahoum-Jayoussi Trustee 01 October 2021 None on record
Neil Simon Hamburger Trustee 01 July 2019
JEWISH ORTHODOX FEMINIST ALLIANCE (UK) Received: On time
Alice Wood Trustee 16 April 2014 None on record
Lyndsay Jane Simmonds Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Ben Shimshon Trustee 28 April 2015 None on record
AMNON BEERI-SULITZEANU Trustee None on record
Ariel Ian Kahn Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Michael Anthony Sampson Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
ALEXANDER BRUMMER Chair 20 October 2015 None on record
Sarah Sackman Trustee 17 October 2016 None on record
Thabet Abu Rass Trustee 11 September 2014 None on record
ROBERT ANDREW NIVEN Trustee 21 February 2013 None on record
LAURIE SCHER Trustee
KEHILLAT NASHIRA Received: On time