MSIZI AFRICA

Charity number: 1119525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Clark Chair 01 January 2014 None on record
Jennifer Miles Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
LUCY ELIZABETH HERRON Trustee None on record
Abisola Mustapha Trustee 24 June 2019 None on record
Daphne Kasambala Trustee 25 January 2019 None on record
Deborah Tara King Trustee 05 May 2017 None on record
Clive Holdsworth Trustee 21 November 2018 None on record
Nicholas Wood Trustee 06 March 2019 None on record