Trustees Waltham Forest Scout District
Charity number: 1119788
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Miller | Chair | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jay Antony Janny-Brewster | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Smith | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Joseph Hurlock | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elysha Sian Ellen Roberts | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Holmes | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zuzana Khan | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Leslie Towler | Trustee | 11 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Paul Symons | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jo Harrison | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Edwards | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.