Accounts and annual returns THE PAUL TRIGWELL MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1120393
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 01 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 04 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required