HOUSE ON THE ROCK CHRISTIAN MINISTRY LTD

Charity number: 1119042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £50.09k £39.78k £33.69k £31.10k £34.66k
Total expenditure £38.51k £45.20k £36.08k £33.24k £32.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A