ASAMAI CULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 1123000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £69.99k £67.86k £155.16k £130.30k £74.16k
Total expenditure £30.11k £27.94k £20.94k £39.30k £18.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £25.00k