THE BOXING ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1119931
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 13 June 2017 On time Download