Accounts and annual returns ST FRANCIS XAVIER'S COLLEGE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118883
Charity reporting is overdue by 1342 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 247 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 247 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 612 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 612 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 977 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 977 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1342 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1342 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required