Financial history ST FRANCIS XAVIER'S COLLEGE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118883
Charity reporting is overdue by 1341 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £6.02k £1.26k £5.82k £4.18k £16.94k
Total expenditure £1.11k £322 £9.77k £18.01k £7.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A