FRIENDS R US LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide culturally appropriate social and drama activities for children and young people in the local BME community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £14,000 from 5 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 29 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FAIGYE GOLDMAN | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHANI JUST | Trustee | 16 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA KATZ | Trustee | 16 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROSE HOFFMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SONIA MOSSBERG | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.35k | £58.22k | £49.55k | £72.38k | £93.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.00k | £63.80k | £12.43k | £72.87k | £77.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 September 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 September 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 June 2021 | 284 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 11 June 2021 | 284 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/01/2012
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF PEOPLE. 2) TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH, BY THE PROVISION TRAINING COURSES, WITH A VIEW TO ENABLING THEM TO ENHANCE THEIR PROSPECTS OF EMPLOYMENT AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS R US LONDON
65-67 AMHURST PARK
LONDON
N16 5DL
- Phone:
- 02088093857
- Email:
- friendsruslondon@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window