Financial history FRIENDS OF MANOR PARK

Charity number: 1119158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.11k £11.72k £15.62k £14.39k £5.38k
Total expenditure £10.76k £11.93k £14.02k £16.13k £9.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A