BLACKWELL ADVENTURE

Charity number: 1121161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £937.42k £781.21k £892.12k £991.22k £645.49k
Total expenditure £899.73k £768.84k £876.14k £923.16k £532.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £163.85k
Income - Donations and legacies £19.41k £6.20k £32.59k £30.57k £406.43k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £917.47k £775.02k £858.98k £960.64k £238.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £533 £0 £546 £0 £238
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £899.73k £768.84k £876.14k £923.16k £532.77k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.47k £7.18k £7.39k £7.60k £7.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0