BLACKWELL ADVENTURE

Charity number: 1121161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY GEORGE SPINKS Trustee 25 January 2021
1ST BADSEY SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
DAVID ANTHONY ALLEN Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
KAREN MARGARET HUNTER Trustee 18 July 2016
ABBEY MEDICAL PRACTICE PATIENTS' TRUST FUND Received: On time
Andrew Keith Lloyd Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
Louise Taylor-Stupple Trustee 25 November 2019 None on record
KENNETH KEITH WILFRED HEMMINGS Trustee 25 November 2019
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HANDSWORTH, ST MARY Received: On time
Alexander David Harverson Trustee 29 January 2018 None on record
PAUL RAYMOND FENNELL Chair 20 July 2015
1ST BANNERS GATE SCOUT GROUP Received: On time