HILDA LANE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 20 July 2017 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 July 2017 262 days late Download