Financial history ST PAUL'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1119619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £41.08m £37.66m £41.23m £40.53m £38.80m
Total expenditure £29.51m £30.91m £35.09m £36.63m £37.16m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £390.00k £156.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.05m £4.41m £5.90m £5.65m £3.83m
Income - Other trading activities £157.00k £120.00k £263.00k £181.00k £130.00k
Income - Charitable activities £31.67m £32.94m £34.49m £34.13m £34.76m
Income - Endowments £1.00m £13.00k £0 £0 £200.00k
Income - Investment £194.00k £195.00k £571.00k £566.00k £274.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.00k
Income - Legacies £3.36m £487.00k £229.00k £7.00k £350.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £28.88m £30.08m £33.04m £34.17m £34.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £630.00k £833.00k £2.05m £2.46m £2.44m
Expenditure - Governance £880.00k £299.00k £783.00k £166.00k £181.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £17.00k £9.00k £10.00k £40.00k £25.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0