NORTH CHESHIRE JEWISH NURSERY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1119430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £368.46k £364.81k £385.54k £423.00k £355.67k
Total expenditure £347.32k £328.78k £328.57k £374.78k £362.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A