NORTH CHESHIRE JEWISH NURSERY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide education and care in an orthodox jewish environment to children under statutory school age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 31 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Toubkin | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Bolchover | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Saknaee Fox | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Dale | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Crane | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £423.00k | £355.67k | £300.36k | £319.24k | £291.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £374.78k | £362.18k | £318.44k | £327.43k | £321.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION IN AN ORTHODOX JEWISH ENVIRONMENT TO CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE. 2) WITHIN AN ORTHODOX JEWISH ENVIRONMENT TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PARENTS IN THE PROVISION OF CHILDCARE.
Area of benefit
NORTH CHESHIRE AND GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Cheshire Jewish Primary Schoo
St. Anns Road North
Heald Green
CHEADLE
SK8 4RZ
- Phone:
- 01612524500
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window