THE GLOBAL FUND FOR CHILDREN UK TRUST

Charity number: 1119544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 23 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 23 February 2017 On time Download