THE GLOBAL FUND FOR CHILDREN UK TRUST

Charity number: 1119544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £555.02k £783.69k £310.54k £344.12k £695.51k
Total expenditure £531.10k £674.73k £403.42k £378.24k £462.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £301.67k £447.65k N/A N/A £695.31k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £253.35k £336.04k N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A N/A £195
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £377.29k £545.91k N/A N/A £385.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds £153.81k £128.82k N/A N/A £76.70k
Expenditure - Governance £8.07k £9.84k N/A N/A £8.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £296.14k £446.34k N/A N/A £317.64k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0