POSITIVE ACTION FOR REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity number: 1120950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £167.02k £252.11k £216.69k £289.73k £370.23k
Total expenditure £155.19k £208.22k £217.67k £259.20k £325.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A