POSITIVE ACTION FOR REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity number: 1120950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES JUDKINS Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
DINAH BECKETT Chair 24 August 2011 None on record
Joudi Altaleb Trustee 22 September 2021 None on record
Katherine Russell Trustee 10 June 2019 None on record
Sipilien Birani Trustee 13 September 2019
RACIAL JUSTICE NETWORK Received: On time
Ella Keevash Trustee 10 June 2019 None on record
Michael Ward Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
Fahad Khan Trustee 27 August 2019 None on record