THE PHOENIX COMMUNITY RESOURCE HUB LTD

Charity number: 1119756
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 December 2016 On time Download