THE PHOENIX COMMUNITY RESOURCE HUB LTD

Charity number: 1119756
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £27.21k £22.60k £37.71k £25.78k £36.65k
Total expenditure £29.18k £26.19k £35.80k £21.08k £42.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A