TABERNACLE OF PRAISE, UPC LONDON - EU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the advancement of the Christian faith and for the benefits of the community at large particularly to help the elderly, children in need, the poor and the women in crisis and generally for similar purposes as the Trustees would decide from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of London
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 09 November 2007: Standard registration
- JESUS CHRIST-THE SACRIFICE OF JOY UNITED PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (UPC) FILIPINO FELLOWSHIP IN THE EUROPEAN UNION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GINA RAYMUNDO | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
RAQUEL FERRER | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
EULALIA FLORES | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALPIANO BACSAL | Trustee | 02 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARIVIC SANGLAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.31k | £18.01k | £42.81k | £68.42k | £64.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.40k | £11.78k | £85.58k | £48.72k | £62.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2024
(These accounts |
24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 May 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 May 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/08/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF IN SUCH WAYS IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
189 High Road
LONDON
NW10 2SD
- Phone:
- 02083503318
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window