EAST ANGLIAN RUSSIAN AND INTERNATIONAL CULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1121269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £24.79k £33.00k £45.14k £41.90k £35.45k
Total expenditure £25.22k £34.20k £33.30k £37.26k £34.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.40k £0 £3.00k N/A £5.00k