THE GREATER MANCHESTER CHURCHES PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1119834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 December 2020 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required