DEAF AND BLIND AID LANKA

Charity number: 1123487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance education and relieve needs of rural deaf and blind schools in Sri Lanka by 1) Holding fund raising events 2) Increase membership 3) Seek donations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £6,726
Total expenditure: £9,173

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Sri Lanka

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 April 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LIONEL WIJESIRI BANDABA WEDIPPOLI MUDIYANSE LAGE Chair 01 August 2012
None on record
Gaz Hameed Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record
Bhumindha Karunatilake Trustee 24 October 2023
None on record
Welikala Terentia Mary Priyani Trustee 07 November 2020
None on record
Ranjith Ananda Chandrasena Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
Nirmalee Dushyanthi Shiroma Peiris Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
MOHAMED HANIFFA FEISAL HUSSAIN Trustee
None on record
NADANI WELIKALA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £11.13k £5.23k £9.23k £8.22k £6.73k
Total expenditure £7.83k £9.26k £7.01k £12.36k £9.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 27 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 29 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 07 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 25 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 22 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
47
Empire Road
Perivale
Greenford
Middlesex
UB6 7EH
Phone:
07930356390