Accounts and annual returns ST VINCENT'S SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1124978
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 March 2022 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 March 2022 629 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 March 2022 629 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 January 2020 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 27 November 2018 150 days late Download Open in new window