HAZARA COMMUNITY MILTON KEYNES

Charity number: 1126803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £144.84k £40.59k £31.11k £87.52k £147.88k
Total expenditure £242.05k £30.08k £26.42k £10.13k £222.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A