SOUTHGATE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1122087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2019 03 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2017 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 Not Required